IL HB4738 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates a deduction in an amount equal to the wages paid to an Illinois-licensed teacher attributable to his or her employment as a teacher in any grade from pre-K through grade 12 at an Illinois public school. Provides that the deduction is exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provision. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-TEACHERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355203Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback