IL HB4737 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Governmental Joint Purchasing Act. Provides that a governmental unit may purchase a supply or service that is available on contracts from multiple contractors if the governmental unit determines that the selected contract best meets the governmental unit's needs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JOINT PURCHASING-RANKING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07HouseSession Sine Die
2024-06-26SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2024-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
2024-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
2024-05-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
2024-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
2024-04-30SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
2024-04-24SenateAssigned to Executive
2024-04-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2024-04-17SenateFirst Reading
2024-04-17SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2024-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2024-04-17SenateArrive in Senate
2024-04-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2024-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2024-04-11HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2024-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
2024-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2024-03-21HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
2024-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2024-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2024-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2024-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2024-02-28HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2024-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2024-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305254Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback