IL HB4736 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of law, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall not require children made eligible for medical assistance through any home and community-based services waiver program for medically fragile and technology dependent children authorized under the Social Security Act to enroll in or transition to the State's managed care medical assistance program. Provides that any medically fragile and technology dependent child who is enrolled in the State's managed care medical assistance program on or before the effective date of the amendatory Act shall be given the option to disenroll from the State's managed care medical assistance program and receive medical assistance coverage under the State's traditional fee-for-service program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAL FRAGILE TECH DEPENDENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-003-000
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care; 008-001-000
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-001-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-04-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 015-000-000
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-2bAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback