IL HB4736 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0990
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0990
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of law, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall not require children made eligible for medical assistance through any home and community-based services waiver program for medically fragile and technology dependent children authorized under the Social Security Act to enroll in or transition to the State's managed care medical assistance program. Provides that any medically fragile and technology dependent child who is enrolled in the State's managed care medical assistance program on or before the effective date of the amendatory Act shall be given the option to disenroll from the State's managed care medical assistance program and receive medical assistance coverage under the State's traditional fee-for-service program.
Title
MEDICAL FRAGILE TECH DEPENDENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0990 |
2018-08-20 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-003-000 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care; 008-001-000 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-001-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-2b | Amended Code | Citation Text |