IL HB4735 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Designations Act. Designates the month of May as "Monarch Month" to be observed throughout the State as a month to honor the Monarch Butterfly. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DESIGNATIONS-MONARCH MONTH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 104-002-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-05-25HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-23HouseArrived in House
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes
2018-05-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2018
2018-05-03SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-001
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
549013New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback