IL HB4734 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0733
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0733
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Military Code of Illinois and the State Finance Act to create the Illinois National Guard Billeting Fund. Further amends the Military Code of Illinois to provide that the Fund shall be funded from proceeds collected by the Department of Military Affairs incident to billeting operations conducted by the Illinois National Guard at locations within the State. Provides that moneys within the Fund shall be used to pay the expenses of billeting operations not eligible for payment with federal or State appropriated funds. Provides that the Department of Military Affairs shall administer the Fund in accordance with the laws of this State, applicable federal requirements governing the use of such funds, and appropriate rules and procedures established by the Adjutant General. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
MILITARY CODE-BILLETING FUND
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Cloonen [D] | Rep. Frank Mautino [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Esther Golar [D] |
Sen. Andy Manar [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0733 |
2014-07-16 | House | Effective Date July 16, 2014 |
2014-07-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2014 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2014 |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000 |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 23, 2014 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 7, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2014-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2014-04-02 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 015-000-000 |
2014-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Veterans' Affairs Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1805 | 22-9.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.855 | New Code | See Bill Text |