IL HB4733 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Pawnbroker Regulation Act. Removes language providing that when a person is found to be the owner of stolen property that has been pawned, the property shall be returned to the owner without payment of money advanced to the pawnbroker or any costs or charges. Provides that stolen property subject to a hold order shall be returned to the owner without the payment. Provides that when a hold order expires, title to the property shall vest in the pawnbroker. Provides that a hold order must specify certain information concerning the criminal investigation and property subject to the hold order. Sets forth the requirements for the contents of the hold order. Provides that a pawnbroker or its representative must sign and date a copy of a hold order as evidence of receipt of the hold order and the beginning of the 90-day hold period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PAWNBROKER-STOLEN PROPERTY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-21SenateRe-assigned to Financial Institutions
2018-05-21SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-11SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenatePostponed - Financial Institutions
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2018-04-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-18SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-18SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-17HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20551012Amended CodeCitation Text
2055109Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback