IL HB4733 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the State Board of Education for its FY13 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2012.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$ST BD ED-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2012-07-27HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2012-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2012-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2012-02-29HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2012-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2012-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2012-02-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback