IL HB4729 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that it is a violation for a person not entitled to the possession of a vehicle or essential part of a vehicle to receive, possess, conceal, sell, dispose, or transfer it with the intent to permanently or temporarily deprive the owner of his or her title to or possession of the vehicle. Deletes language providing that it may be inferred that a person exercising exclusive unexplained possession over a stolen or converted vehicle or an essential part of a stolen or converted vehicle has knowledge that such vehicle or essential part is stolen or converted. Provides instead that the trier of fact may infer that a person intends to permanently or temporarily deprive the owner of his or her title to or possession of the vehicle if the person: (i) operates a vehicle or possesses an essential part of a vehicle without the consent of the owner; or (ii) exercises exclusive unexplained possession over a vehicle or an essential part of a vehicle.
Title
VEH CD-FELONIES-STOLEN VEHICLE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-02-14 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-02-13 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2018-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 4-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |