IL HB4725 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that if and only if Senate Bill 1657 of the 100th General Assembly becomes law in the form in which it passed the Senate on April 27, 2017, then the Gun Dealer Licensing Act is amended by providing that the requirement that a licensee who operates the business at a permanent physical location that is open to the public, that location shall be equipped with a video surveillance system sufficient to monitor the critical areas of the business premises, including, but not limited to, all places where firearms are stored, handled, sold, transferred, or carried does not take effect until January 1, 2021, provides that a video surveillance system of the licensee's business premises may not be installed in a bathroom and may not monitor the bathrooms located in the business premises, provides the expiration date and renewal period for each license shall be 5 years, and provides that an application fee or renewal fee for a dealership license or a dealer license shall not exceed $1,000 for the 5-year period. Effective upon Senate Bill 1657 of the 100th General Assembly becoming law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GUN DEALER LICENSING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2018-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback