IL HB4711 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0595
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. In provisions regarding building or structure zoning violations, provides that, except in relation to county-owned property, the provisions do not authorize any suit against a county or its officials for any act relating to zoning administration, enforcement, or implementation or any ordinance, resolution, or other zoning regulation. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SUITS AGAINST COUNTIES-ZONING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0595
2018-06-29HouseEffective Date June 29, 2018
2018-06-29HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 105-000-000
2018-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2018-05-23HouseArrived in House
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Curran
2018-05-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 005-000-000
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Local Government; 005-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Local Government
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-001-000
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-10HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-04-10HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2018-03-23HouseTo Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee
2018-03-07HouseRemains in Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-02-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-02-14HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5555-12017Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4711&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4711.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4711eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4711enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0595.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4711ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4711sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4711sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4711_04182018_012000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB4711_05232018_051000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4711sam002_05312018_058000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback