IL HB4710 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public universities and community colleges in Illinois. Provides that the Board of Trustees of a public university or community college district in this State may not enter into an agreement or allow any person or group affiliated with the university or district to enter into an agreement with a credit card issuer to allow the credit card issuer to market credit cards to students. Defines terms. Repeals the Credit Card Marketing Act of 2009. Makes conforming changes in the Freedom of Information Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED-CREDITCARD MARKETING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 42 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Financial Institutions; 005-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 062-042-000
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 012-004-000
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Higher Education Committee; 011-008-001
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11026ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
110305100New CodeSee Bill Text
11052085New CodeSee Bill Text
1106605-195New CodeSee Bill Text
11066510-195New CodeSee Bill Text
11067015-195New CodeSee Bill Text
11067520-200New CodeSee Bill Text
11068025-195New CodeSee Bill Text
11068530-205New CodeSee Bill Text
11069035-200New CodeSee Bill Text
1108053-29.12New CodeSee Bill Text
51407Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback