IL HB4710 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public universities and community colleges in Illinois. Provides that the Board of Trustees of a public university or community college district in this State may not enter into an agreement or allow any person or group affiliated with the university or district to enter into an agreement with a credit card issuer to allow the credit card issuer to market credit cards to students. Defines terms. Repeals the Credit Card Marketing Act of 2009. Makes conforming changes in the Freedom of Information Act.
Title
HIGHER ED-CREDITCARD MARKETING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 42 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 42 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | House | Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto |
2018-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2018-08-13 | House | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2018-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 062-042-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 012-004-000 |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Higher Education Committee; 011-008-001 |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 26 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
110 | 305 | 100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 520 | 85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 660 | 5-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 665 | 10-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 670 | 15-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 675 | 20-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 680 | 25-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 685 | 30-205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 690 | 35-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 3-29.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |