IL HB4707 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Changes the classification of Hydrocodone from a Schedule II controlled substance to a Schedule I controlled substance. Amends the Illinois Optometric Practice Act of 1987 to make a conforming change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONTROLLED SUB-HYDROCODONE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 101 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 101-006-000
2018-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee
2018-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-23HouseArrived in House
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush
2018-05-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 006-000-000
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Public Health; 005-000-002
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-003-001
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 007-003-000
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2258015.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720570204Amended CodeCitation Text
720570206Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4707&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4707.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4707eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4707enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4707ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4707ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4707ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4707ham004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4707sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4707_04262018_038000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB4707_05232018_050000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4707sam001_05312018_057000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback