IL HB4706 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Health Facilities Planning Act. Adds "managed care entities" to the definition of "health care facilities" under the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
HEALTH FAC-MANAGED CARE ENTITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | House | Tabled |
2014-05-07 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-24 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3960 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4706&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB4706.htm |