IL HB4704 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Right to Garden Act. Allows the State or a unit of local government to regulate gardens on residential property unless the statute or regulation has the practical effect of precluding gardens on residential property entirely. Defines the terms "garden" and "residential property". Limits home rule powers. Effective immediately.
Title
RIGHT TO GARDEN ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2020-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2020-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2020-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2020-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2020-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |