IL HB4701 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Police Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a police officer who previously participated in the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) for service as a member of the police department of a municipality and was transferred to that municipality's police pension fund upon its creation under the Downstate Police Article shall, for the purposes of determining the applicable tier of benefits under that Article, be deemed to have become a police officer and member of that municipality's police pension fund on the date that he or she first participated in IMRF as a member of the police department of that municipality, notwithstanding whether that start date was before January 1, 2011. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-IMRF-DNST POL-START DATE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 39 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 065-039-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-004-001 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.42 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 3-111.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |