IL HB4691 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Decennial Committees on Local Government Consolidation and Efficiency Act. Provides that within one year after the effective date of the Act and at least once every 10 years thereafter, each unit of local government (except municipalities and counties) must form a committee to: study local efficiencies, including an analysis of whether to consolidate with another governmental unit, municipality, or county; and create a report with recommendations regarding efficiencies, increased accountability, and consolidation. Provides that the duties of the committee include, but are not limited to, the study of the unit of local government's governing statutes, ordinances, rules, procedures, powers, jurisdiction, shared services, intergovernmental agreements, and interrelationships with other units of local government and the State. Provides that the committee shall collect data, research, analysis, and public input. Dissolves the committee after completion of its report and oral presentation of the report. Contains provisions about committee membership, meetings, and report requirements. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL GOV CONSOLIDATION-10 YRS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeff Keicher |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4691&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4691.htm |