IL HB4688 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0949
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0949
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. In provisions concerning the debt limitations of school districts, provides that, in addition to all other authority to issue bonds, Mahomet-Seymour Community Unit School District 3 may issue bonds with an aggregate principal amount not to exceed $97,900,000, subject to specified conditions; New Berlin Community Unit School District 16 may issue bonds with an aggregate principal amount not to exceed $23,500,000, subject to specified conditions; Highland Community Unit School District 5 may issue bonds with an aggregate principal amount not to exceed $40,000,000, subject to specified conditions; Sullivan Community Unit School District 300 may issue bonds with an aggregate principal amount not to exceed $25,000,000, subject to specified conditions; Manhattan School District 114 may issue bonds with an aggregate principal amount not to exceed $85,000,000, subject to specified conditions; and Golf Elementary School District 67 may issue bonds with an aggregate principal amount not to exceed $56,000,000, subject to specified conditions. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-EDUCATOR EVALUATIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 93 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0949 |
2022-05-27 | House | Effective Date May 27, 2022 |
2022-05-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-08 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-08 | House | House Concurs |
2022-04-08 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 093-019-001 |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra Hamilton |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 005-003-000 |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2022-04-06 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2022-04-06 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 6, 2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 5, 2022 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 4, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Chapin Rose |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 104-000-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-02-24 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-02-24 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 24A-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 24A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 24A-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |