IL HB4688 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Nursing Home Administrators Licensing and Disciplinary Act. Provides that all applicants and licensees shall provide a valid address and email address, which shall serve as the address and email address of record, and shall inform the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation of any change of address or email address through specified means. Adds provisions concerning confidentiality of information collected by the Department. Makes changes in provisions concerning definitions, the Nursing Home Administrators Licensing and Disciplinary Board, powers and duties of the Department, application procedures, rosters, grounds for disciplinary action, reports of violations of the Act, summary suspensions, hearings and motions for rehearing, administrative review, and certification of record. Repeals provisions concerning Board hearings and recommendations, surrender of licenses, rehearings, and fraud and deception by applicants. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SUNSET ACT-NURSING HOME

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 017-000-000
2018-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-03-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 016-000-000
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2257016Amended CodeCitation Text
2257017Amended CodeCitation Text
2257017.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2257019Amended CodeCitation Text
2257020Repealed CodeCitation Text
2257020.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2257021Amended CodeCitation Text
2257023Amended CodeCitation Text
2257024Amended CodeCitation Text
2257024.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
2257025Amended CodeCitation Text
2257026.5New CodeSee Bill Text
2257028Repealed CodeCitation Text
2257031Repealed CodeCitation Text
2257032Amended CodeCitation Text
2257033Amended CodeCitation Text
2257035Amended CodeCitation Text
225704Amended CodeCitation Text
225704.5New CodeSee Bill Text
225705Amended CodeCitation Text
225705.1Amended CodeCitation Text
225706Amended CodeCitation Text
225706.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback