IL HB4687 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Guardians for Adults With Disabilities Article of the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that an adult child, spouse, adult grandchild, parent, adult sibling, or other interested person (instead of an adult child) may petition for visitation privileges with the ward. Provides that "other interested person" means any person who has a significant, ongoing relationship based on or productive of strong affection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADULT GUARDIANSHIP-VISITATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-22HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-16HouseArrived in House
2018-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 008-000-000
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-04-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-24SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2018-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-20HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-10HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-04-10HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2018-03-23HouseTo Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
755511a-17Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback