IL HB4686 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that if a person files a complaint in circuit court alleging that a unit of local government has violated State preemption under the Act by adopting an ordinance or resolution restricting a licensee or business under the Act and the court finds that the allegations in the complaint are true, the court shall order that the unit of local government pay plaintiff's court costs, attorney's fees, actual damages, and at least $1,000 per day per violation in punitive damages from the time of the filing of the complaint as the court deems appropriate. Effective immediately.
Title
CONCEALED CARRY-PREEMPTION
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Sullivan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-24 | House | To Firearms Subcommittee |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 66 | 90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4686&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB4686.htm |