IL HB4685 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Reducing the Risk of Skin Cancer and Excessive UV Exposure in Children Act. Provides that a student or participant in a youth camp may possess and use a topical sunscreen product while on school property or at a school-sponsored event or activity or youth camp without a physician's note or prescription if certain conditions are met. Provides that a school district or youth camp shall allow a student or participant to use articles of sun-protective clothing outdoors. Provides that, beginning with the 2019-2020 school year, all schools districts shall incorporate in their curriculum a unit of instruction on skin cancer prevention. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UV EXPOSURE IN CHILDREN ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-000-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Connor
2018-03-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-03-13HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John Connor

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback