IL HB4683 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $5,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the State Board of Education for a $1,000,000 grant to the Chicago Board of Education each year for 5 years, subject to reappropriation by the General Assembly, for the Department of JROTC Leadership to update classroom equipment, purchase drum and bugle instruments, support a training facility, establish weekend training retreats, purchase uniforms and uniform accessories, provide drone and simulator training, support retired veteran staffing assistants, and host an end-of-the-year graduation banquet. Effective July 1, 2024.
Title
$ST BD ED-CHICAGO-JROTC
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cyril Nichols |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4683&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/PDF/10300HB4683.pdf |