IL HB4677 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Amusement Ride and Attraction Safety Act. Repeals a provision providing that all fees collected under the Act shall be deposited into the General Revenue Fund. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AMUSEMENT RIDE SAFETY ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Labor; 016-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Labor
2018-03-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-13SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-03-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 025-000-000
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
430852-11Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback