IL HB4677 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0755
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0755
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Amusement Ride and Attraction Safety Act. Repeals a provision providing that all fees collected under the Act shall be deposited into the General Revenue Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
AMUSEMENT RIDE SAFETY ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0755 |
2018-08-10 | House | Effective Date August 10, 2018 |
2018-08-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 016-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-03-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 025-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 85 | 2-11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |