IL HB4677 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1067
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1067
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Title Insurance Act. Deletes language that sunsets a provision concerning disbursement of settlement funds out of fiduciary trust accounts on January 1, 2015.
Title
TITLE INS-SETTLEMENT FUNDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - Senate - Amendment in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1067 |
2014-08-26 | House | Effective Date August 26, 2014 |
2014-08-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Recedes 056-000-000 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-29 | House | House Non-Concurs |
2014-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Prevailed ; -Non-concur |
2014-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. Ron Sandack |
2014-05-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2014-05-21 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-21 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Ron Sandack |
2014-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-001 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Haine |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2014 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 013-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 3, 2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-002 |
2014-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 013-000-000 |
2014-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Financial Institutions Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ron Sandack |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ron Sandack |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 155 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |