IL HB4673 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-29 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-29 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that the prohibition on issuance of a Firearm Owner's Identification Card and the grounds for revocation of such Card for being a patient in a mental institution within the past 5 years or for being adjudicated as a mental defective do not apply to an active law enforcement officer employed by a unit of local government. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-FIREARM OWNERS ID
Sponsors
Rep. Dena Carli [D] | Rep. Esther Golar [D] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] |
Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. William Delgado [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto |
2012-11-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 14, 2012 |
2012-08-17 | House | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2012-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-22 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-001-001 |
2012-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2012-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dena M. Carli |
2012-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2012-05-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2012 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2012 |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 009-000-000 |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2012-05-04 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 25, 2012 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Mu |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2012-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Mu |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2012-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-005-002 |
2012-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2012-03-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dena M. Carli |
2012-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2012-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2012-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dena M. Carli |
2012-03-06 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2012-03-06 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2012-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dena M. Carli |
2012-02-07 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2012-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dena M. Carli |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |