IL HB4666 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Pedestrians with Disabilities Safety Act. Provides that the Governor is authorized and requested to issue a proclamation on Pedestrians with Disabilities Safety Day which: (i) reminds citizens, park districts, and other special recreation districts of the State (rather than only citizens) of the policies with respect to persons with disabilities and urges all citizens and governmental personnel (rather than only citizens) to ensure that the policies are upheld; and (ii) emphasize the need of all citizens and governmental personnel (rather than only citizens) to be aware of the presence of persons with disabilities in the community and to keep safe and functional for persons with disabilities the streets, sidewalks, highways, walkways, and walking, running, or bicycle paths of this State. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOV: SAFETY DAY PROCLAMATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-14HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Special Needs Services; 005-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Special Needs Services
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6256020Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback