IL HB4665 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Provides that the Division of Developmental Disabilities of the Department of Human Services shall implement a direct support professional credential pilot program to assist and attract persons into the field of direct support, advance direct support as a career, and professionalize the developmental disabilities field to promote workforce recruitment and retention efforts, advance skills and competencies, and further ensure the health, safety, and well-being of persons being served. Amends the Health Care Worker Background Check Act. Defines "nursing or nursing-related services for pay". Amends the Nurse Practice Act. Provides that a certified nursing assistant shall lose his or her certification status if he or she goes 24 consecutive months without performing nursing or nursing-related services for pay. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services and the Department of Human Services shall jointly submit the necessary application to the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for a waiver or State Plan Amendment to allow remote monitoring and supports services for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities and seniors requiring in-home care, as a waiver reimbursable service. Provides that the application shall be submitted no later than September 30, 2018. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DIRECT SUPPORT PROFESSIONAL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2018-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-20HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-12HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2017054.4New CodeSee Bill Text
2254633Amended CodeCitation Text
2256580-41New CodeSee Bill Text
305512-21.21New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback