IL HB4665 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0754
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0754
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Provides that the Division of Developmental Disabilities of the Department of Human Services shall implement a direct support professional credential pilot program to assist and attract persons into the field of direct support, advance direct support as a career, and professionalize the developmental disabilities field to promote workforce recruitment and retention efforts, advance skills and competencies, and further ensure the health, safety, and well-being of persons being served. Amends the Health Care Worker Background Check Act. Defines "nursing or nursing-related services for pay". Amends the Nurse Practice Act. Provides that a certified nursing assistant shall lose his or her certification status if he or she goes 24 consecutive months without performing nursing or nursing-related services for pay. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services and the Department of Human Services shall jointly submit the necessary application to the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for a waiver or State Plan Amendment to allow remote monitoring and supports services for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities and seniors requiring in-home care, as a waiver reimbursable service. Provides that the application shall be submitted no later than September 30, 2018. Effective immediately.
Title
DIRECT SUPPORT PROFESSIONAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0754 |
2018-08-10 | House | Effective Date August 10, 2018 |
2018-08-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2018-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2018-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1705 | 4.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 46 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 80-41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-21.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |