IL HB4664 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-15 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-15 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Open Meetings Act. Provides that an elected or appointed member of a public body who fails to complete training on compliance with the Open Meetings Act, within 30 days of receiving notice from the public body that he or she has failed to complete training, is disqualified from further service as a member of the public body.
Title
OPEN MEETINGS ACT-TRAINING
Sponsors
Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. David Harris [R] | Rep. Jeanne Ives [R] |
Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] | Rep. David Olsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2016-04-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2016-04-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
2016-04-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 120 | 1.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |