IL HB4663 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that nothing in provisions concerning the designation of a candidate's name on a nomination petition or ballot shall require a candidate to use his or her spouse's surname after marriage, or to return to his or her previous legal surname following a dissolution of marriage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-CANDIDATE SURNAMES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 015-000-000
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1057-10.2Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-17Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback