IL HB4663 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that nothing in provisions concerning the designation of a candidate's name on a nomination petition or ballot shall require a candidate to use his or her spouse's surname after marriage, or to return to his or her previous legal surname following a dissolution of marriage.
Title
ELEC CD-CANDIDATE SURNAMES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 7-10.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 7-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |