IL HB4661 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that for an elected or appointed trustee under the Downstate Police or Downstate Firefighter Article of the Code, fulfillment of certain trustee training requirements satisfies certain ethics training requirements. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-TRUSTEE ETHICS TRAINING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 011-000-000
2018-02-14HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4051-113.18Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback