IL HB4659 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Chicago Police Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Removes a birthdate restriction on eligibility at age 55 for a 3% automatic annual increase in retirement annuity that is not subject to a maximum increase of 30%. Makes a related change. Specifies the timing of an initial increase in retirement annuity for persons who have not received the initial increase before January 1, 2019. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-CHI POL-ANNUAL INCREASE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-042-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-25HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-003-001
2018-04-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-16HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-04-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-04-16HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-02-14HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4055-167.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback