IL HB4658 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires a school board to adopt and implement a policy on how to recognize mental health issues and how to properly address them. Provides that, as part of this policy, a school board shall require in-service training of licensed school personnel and administrators to include, at least once every 2 years, training on the current best practices regarding the identification of and recommended courses of action for mental health issues. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-MENTAL HEALTH AWARENESS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateDo Pass Education; 008-000-000
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Education
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-000-000
2018-04-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-16HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2018-04-12HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-11HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-11HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 011-005-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.39Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback