IL HB4658 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires a school board to adopt and implement a policy on how to recognize mental health issues and how to properly address them. Provides that, as part of this policy, a school board shall require in-service training of licensed school personnel and administrators to include, at least once every 2 years, training on the current best practices regarding the identification of and recommended courses of action for mental health issues. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-MENTAL HEALTH AWARENESS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2018-04-12HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-11HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-11HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 011-005-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.39Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback