IL HB4655 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes changes concerning the allocation of compensation paid to nonresidents to provide that the allocation is based on the number of working days spent in this State. Makes corresponding changes concerning employer withholding requirements. Creates a credit in an amount equal to the amount of the investment made by the taxpayer during the taxable year in qualified property and qualified expenses that are used for tracking and reporting the location of resident and non-resident employees for purposes of compliance with the tracking, reporting, and income tax withholding requirements of the amendatory Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-NONRESIDENTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355227New CodeSee Bill Text
355302Amended CodeCitation Text
355601Amended CodeCitation Text
355701Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback