IL HB4655 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code with respect to the suspension and expulsion of pupils. Provides for the expulsion of pupils by removing a pupil from a school or educational setting for a period of more than 10 school days for posing a significant threat of imminent serious harm to other pupils or to staff (instead of providing for the expulsion of pupils guilty of gross disobedience or misconduct). Provides for the suspension of pupils by removing a pupil from a school or educational setting for a period of not more than 10 days for a serious act of misconduct (instead of providing for the suspension of pupils guilty of gross disobedience or misconduct); makes related changes. Sets forth limitations on out-of-school suspensions. Requires behavioral support services and alternative educational services to be provided to certain students. Provides that, unless otherwise required by statute for a specific criminal offense, a student may not be arrested or otherwise cited for a criminal offense committed during school hours while on school grounds, in a school vehicle, or at a school activity or school-sanctioned event unless the offense constitutes a felony or the student has committed an identical offense within the preceding 6 months. Requires reports to be made for certain incidents. Provides that students may not be counseled by any school employee to leave school voluntarily in order to avoid formal disciplinary proceedings or because of any other disciplinary concerns. Provides that a student may not be issued a monetary fine or fee as a disciplinary consequence. Provides for charter school and alternative school application.
Title
SCH CD-STUDENT DISCIPLINE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2014-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2014-04-04 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2014-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 009-004-000 |
2014-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2014-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2014-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2014-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2014-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2014-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2014-02-20 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 13A-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |