IL HB4651 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Wind Energy Facilities Agricultural Impact Mitigation Act. Provides that the Act may be cited as the Renewable Energy Facilities Agricultural Impact Mitigation Act. Changes references in the Act from "commercial wind energy facility" to "commercial renewable energy facility". Provides that "commercial renewable energy facility" means a commercial wind energy facility or commercial solar energy facility. Defines "commercial solar energy facility". Provides that for commercial renewable energy facility owners of a commercial solar energy facility, the agricultural impact mitigation agreement shall be entered into prior to the commercial renewable energy facility owner making contact with a landowner seeking an underlying agreement for the development of a commercial solar energy facility. Makes conforming changes in the Counties Code and the Illinois Municipal Code. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AGR-RENEWABLE ENERGY FACILITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Energy Committee; 009-000-000
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Energy Committee; 008-000-000
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Energy Committee
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5051471Amended CodeCitation Text
50514710Amended CodeCitation Text
50514715Amended CodeCitation Text
5051475Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-12020Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-13-26Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback