IL HB4651 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wind Energy Facilities Agricultural Impact Mitigation Act. Provides that the Act may be cited as the Renewable Energy Facilities Agricultural Impact Mitigation Act. Changes references in the Act from "commercial wind energy facility" to "commercial renewable energy facility". Provides that "commercial renewable energy facility" means a commercial wind energy facility or commercial solar energy facility. Defines "commercial solar energy facility". Provides that for commercial renewable energy facility owners of a commercial solar energy facility, the agricultural impact mitigation agreement shall be entered into prior to the commercial renewable energy facility owner making contact with a landowner seeking an underlying agreement for the development of a commercial solar energy facility. Makes conforming changes in the Counties Code and the Illinois Municipal Code. Effective immediately.
Title
AGR-RENEWABLE ENERGY FACILITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Energy Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Energy Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
505 | 147 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 147 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 147 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 147 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-12020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 11-13-26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |