IL HB4650 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Controlled Substance Act. In a provision allowing pharmacists to authorize a designee to consult the Prescription Monitoring Program on their behalf, defines "pharmacist" to include, but be not limited to, a pharmacist associated with a health maintenance organization or a Medicaid managed care entity providing services under the Illinois Public Aid Code. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONTROL SUB-PRESCRIP MONITOR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care
2018-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care; 009-000-000
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-001
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 017-000-000
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720570316Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback