IL HB4647 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Interscholastic Athletic Organization Act. Provides that an association or other entity that has as one of its purposes promoting, sponsoring, regulating, or in any manner providing for interscholastic athletics or any form of athletic competition among schools and students within this State shall adopt a policy that allows for a student to participate in interscholastic athletics immediately upon completing a transfer from one school to another school and enrolling in that other school. Provides that the policy may prohibit the student from participating in interscholastic athletics at that other school before the school transfer process is complete and the transfer has been accepted by the principal of the school from which the student is transferring and the principal of the school to which the student is transferring. Effective July 1, 2024.
Title
INTERSCHOLASTIC ATHLETIC ORG
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4647&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4647.htm |