IL HB4645 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1138
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Health Facilities Planning Act. Extends the repeal date of the Act from December 31, 2019 to December 31, 2029. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEALTH FACILITIES-REPEAL DATE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-28 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 89 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1138
2018-11-30HouseEffective Date November 28, 2018
2018-11-28HouseBoth Houses Override Total Veto
2018-11-28SenateOverride Governor Veto - Senate Passed 053-001-000
2018-11-28Senate3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-28SenateMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-11-14SenatePlaced Calendar Total Veto November 15, 2018
2018-11-14HouseOverride Governor Veto - House Passed 089-021-001
2018-11-14House3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-13HouseMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. William Davis
2018-11-13HousePlaced on Calendar Total Veto
2018-08-10HouseGovernor Vetoed
2018-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-001-000
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2018
2018-05-03SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-050-000
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20396019.6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4645&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4645.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4645eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4645enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4645gms.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-1138.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4645_04182018_011000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB4645_05162018_020000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4645_11142018_008000M.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB4645_11282018_010000M.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback