IL HB4644 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code and the Fire Protection District Act. Provides that a person 35 years of age or older who has served a municipality as a regularly enrolled volunteer, paid-on-call, or part-time firefighter is eligible to take an examination for a position as a firefighter (removing a requirement the volunteer, paid-on-call, or part-time work was 5 years immediately preceding the time that the municipality begins to use full-time firefighters to provide all or part of its fire protection service). Effective immediately.
Title
FIREFIGHTER EXAMINATION AGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Darren Bailey |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 10-1-7.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 10-2.1-6.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 705 | 16.06b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4644&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4644.htm |