IL HB4643 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-15)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Physical Therapy Act. Provides that the limitation on determining a differential diagnosis shall not in any manner limit a physical therapist from establishing a relevant diagnosis. In the definition of "documented current and relevant diagnosis" and in provisions concerning disciplinary actions, removes language requiring a diagnosis to be substantiated by a physician, dentist, advanced practice registered nurse, physician assistant, or podiatric physician. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PHYSICAL THERAPY-DIAGNOSIS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-001
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 095-000-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-27HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-26HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 016-000-000
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 013-002-000
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-02-13HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
225901Amended CodeCitation Text
2259017Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback