IL HB4637 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Enrolled on November 29 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Local Land Resource Management Planning Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 78 N: 23 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 80 N: 22 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-11-29HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. David McSweeney
2018-11-29HousePassed Both Houses
2018-11-29HouseHouse Concurs
2018-11-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 078-023-001
2018-11-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-11-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. David McSweeney
2018-11-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-11-27HouseArrived in House
2018-11-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 033-016-003
2018-11-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-11-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Link
2018-11-27SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-11-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-11-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-11-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2018-11-20SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-11-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 15, 2018
2018-11-14SenateSecond Reading
2018-11-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-11-14SenateDo Pass Executive; 011-006-000
2018-11-07SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-04-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-18SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-18SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-17HouseMotion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-17HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-17HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 080-022-001
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-09HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. David McSweeney
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee
2018-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
508051Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback