IL HB4634 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6551-1-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback