IL HB4631 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Increases the maximum rate for the county school facility occupation tax from 1% to 2%. Provides that, in addition to the uses currently provided for by law, proceeds from the tax may also be used for transportation costs and technology investments. Effective July 1, 2016.
Title
CNTY CD-SCHOOL FACILITIES
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Smiddy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Smiddy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1006.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4631&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB4631.htm |